MA H1273 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the definition of affordable housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a commission to study the definition of affordable housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02JointHearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H729 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H2026 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
H171 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2741 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H2962 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1861 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H190 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2221 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H4070 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
S2421 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2437 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback