MA S2389 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to affordable housing in the town of Shrewsbury. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to affordable housing in the town of Shrewsbury

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
2019-12-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-12-02JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-11-27HouseHouse concurred
2019-10-30SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing
2019-10-30SenateRules suspended
2019-02-28SenateReferred to the committee on Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

S804 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1273 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S814 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1269 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2421 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback