IL SB3305 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Dental Loss Ratio Act. Sets forth provisions concerning dental loss ratio reporting. Provides that a health insurer or dental plan carrier that issues, sells, renews, or offers a specialized health insurance policy covering dental services shall, beginning January 1, 2025, annually submit to the Department of Insurance a dental loss ratio filing. Provides a formula for calculating minimum dental loss ratios. Sets forth provisions concerning minimum dental loss ratio requirements. Provides that the Department may adopt rules to implement the Act. Provides that the Act does not apply to an insurance policy issued, sold, renewed, or offered for health care services or coverage provided as a function of the State of Illinois Medicaid coverage for children or adults or disability insurance for covered benefits in the single specialized area of dental-only health care that pays benefits on a fixed benefit, cash payment-only basis. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DENTAL LOSS RATIO ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |