MA H2457 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize cities and towns to impose a fee up to 2 per cent of the purchase price upon the transfer of certain real property. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering cities and towns to impose a fee on home sales over one million dollars to support affordable housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2668 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2961 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S814 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S813 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H341 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S804 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S216 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2421 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback