MA S630 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to disability insurance benefits. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to disability insurance benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-28JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H2395 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H633 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2401 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2164 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1512 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2348 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1548 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S1687 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2317 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
H3138 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H4006 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4097 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback