MA S63 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to expanding access to adoption. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to expanding access to adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #269 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #269 (yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read third |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1359 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2676
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1359 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2676
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S63 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S63.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/191/SenateRollCall269.pdf |