MA S1359 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Architectural Access Board. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Architectural Access Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2072 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1936 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1993 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S163 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S702 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1865 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1419 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S437 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S877 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S487 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1421 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1365 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback