MA S546 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote value-based insurance design in the Commonwealth. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote value-based insurance design in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2017-11-21JointHearing rescheduled to 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-11-20JointHearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S578 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S579 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S562 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S563 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S564 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S1474 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H588 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H497 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H587 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
H498 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H34 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Senate concurred
H4110 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback