MA H498 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to flood insurance rates. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an investigation to review flood insurance rates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2017-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H521 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H562 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback