MA H497 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Attorney General to provide for a study of the methodology used to promulgate new flood insurance rate maps through the National Flood Insurance Program. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to an investigation of flood insurance by the attorney general
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H497 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H497.pdf |