MA S517 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2923

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to save recycling costs in the commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To save recycling costs in the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-16SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2923
2022-05-24SenateSenate concurred
2022-05-16HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-04-28SenateSenate concurred
2022-04-04HouseReporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-03-03SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S610 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2923
H878 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4851
S572 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
S2317 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
S1237 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S566 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S500 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1332 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H4851 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2923 (Replaced by) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback