MA S1237 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2691
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a prevailing wage for trash and recycling collectors, moving contractors, and motor bus pupil transporters. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to a prevailing wage for trash and recycling collectors, moving contractors, and motor bus pupil transporters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2691 |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1964 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
H2046 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S2691 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1996 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4611
H2054 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1203
H1964 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
H2046 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S2691 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1996 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4611
H2054 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1203
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1237.pdf |