MA S464 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to environmental justice and toxics reduction in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to environmental justice and toxics reduction in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Accompanied by S453 |
2019-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1295 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S173 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H171 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4497
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2505 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H761 (Similar To) 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4264
H3661 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H4084 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S453 (Replaces) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied S464
S1295 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S173 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H171 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4497
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2505 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H761 (Similar To) 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4264
H3661 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H4084 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S453 (Replaces) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied S464
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S464 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S464.pdf |