MA H761 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to exposure to environmental toxins. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to environmental justice and toxics reduction in the Commonwealth

Sponsors

Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H2795 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S453 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2877 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback