MA S370 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the Massachusetts home care program. Elder Affairs.
Title
To strengthen the Massachusetts home care program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4620 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, April 25, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4620 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S477 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1854 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S477 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1854 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S370 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S370.pdf |