MA S2843 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3147
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S3147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S3147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the select board of the town of Wenham. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to the select board of the town of Wenham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S3147 |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Read third |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2022
S2936 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3166
S3147 (Replaced by) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2022
S2936 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3166
S3147 (Replaced by) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2843 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2843.pdf |