MA S2661 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Richard G. Perry, an employee of the Department of Conservation and Recreation. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Richard G. Perry, an employee of the Department of Conservation and Recreation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-31 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2018
2018-10-22SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-10-22HouseEnacted
2018-10-18SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-10-18HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-10-15HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-10-11HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-10-11HouseRules suspended
2018-10-11HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-10-09HouseRead; and referred to the House Committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-10-04SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-10-04SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-09-27SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-09-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2018-09-17HouseHouse concurred
2018-08-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2018-08-23SenateRules suspended
2018-08-09SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
S17 (Similar To) 2017-02-10 - Accompanied S20
H4919 (Similar To) 2018-10-01 - Senate concurred
S2668 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
H4943 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4957 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4954 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback