MA S2604 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S336
Note: Replaces legislation S358
Note: Replaces legislation S358
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the Nursing Home Quality Jobs Initiative (Senate, No. 358), reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2604).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Health Care Financing to make an investigation and study of certain current Senate documents relative to the financing and delivery of care in nursing facilities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-30 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Accompanied by S336 and S358 |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S336 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S358 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S358 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2604 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2604.pdf |