MA S2598 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2627
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To protect children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2627 |
2022-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-13 | House | House concurred |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2627 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2627 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2598 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2598.pdf |