MA S2461 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ban marijuana billboards. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Banning marijuana billboards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-01-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2020-01-09 | House | House concurred |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2461.pdf |