MA S246 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2351

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the calculation of economically disadvantaged students. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the calculation of economically disadvantaged students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2351
2017-07-20JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S37 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S219 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S263 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S699 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H246 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2351 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback