MA S129 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2380

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a student loan bill of rights. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a student loan bill of rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateNew draft substituted, see S2380
2018-04-04SenatePostponed to Wednesday, April 11, 2018
2018-04-04SenateRead second
2018-03-29SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 4, 2018
2018-03-29SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2018-03-29SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2380
2018-03-29SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-02-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-07-13JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S219 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S263 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S229 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S285 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2351
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S697 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1524 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H630 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H276 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H634 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4286
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2232 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3934
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H225 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S2380 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback