MA H4120 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the fees for application for certain drivers' licenses and state identification cards for non-drivers. Transportation.
Title
Ensuring access to state IDs for low-income people
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4597 |
2018-01-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-12-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4120 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4120.pdf |