MA S2444 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Melvin Maldonado, an employee of the Department of Mental Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Melvin Maldonado, an employee of the Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-06-14 | House | Enacted |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-06-11 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-06-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-05-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-17 | House | House concurred |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
S17 (Similar To) 2017-02-10 - Accompanied S20
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2668 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2018
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
S2672 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 395 of the Acts of 2018
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
S17 (Similar To) 2017-02-10 - Accompanied S20
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2668 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2018
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
S2672 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 395 of the Acts of 2018
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2444 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2444.pdf |