MA S2254 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H345
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislation to establish a curriculum on personal financial literacy in the public schools and of Jonathan D. Zlotnik and others relative to establishing a personal finance, civic responsibility and general legal high school social studies curriculum,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2254).
Title
Relative to financial literacy in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-04-28 | Senate | New draft of H345, H349, H390, H507, H512, S258, S275 and S279 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H345 (Replaces) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
S2315 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2329 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3939 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2016
S2047 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2]
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S299 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S263 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S292 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1125 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1326 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S757 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S1956 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Enacted
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
S2315 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2329 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3939 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2016
S2047 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2]
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S299 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S263 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S292 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1125 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1326 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S757 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S1956 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Enacted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2254.pdf |