MA S757 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2064
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Creem, a petition of Cynthia S. Creem, John V. Fernandes and Marcos A. Devers for legistlation to regulate notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments. The Judiciary.
Title
Regulating notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2064 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read third |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Spilka) adopted |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) rejected |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read second |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 18, 2015 |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2064 (Replaces) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
S681 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S131 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2377
S690 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
H1378 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S175 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Reprinted as amended, see S2194
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S681 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S131 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2377
S690 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
H1378 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S175 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Reprinted as amended, see S2194
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S757 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S757.pdf |