MA S2227 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand offshore wind development in the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To expand offshore wind development in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4348 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3370 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3371 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2144 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2014 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
H4515 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Published as amended, see H4524
H3301 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2158 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3370 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3371 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2144 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2014 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
H4515 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Published as amended, see H4524
H3301 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2158 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2227.pdf |