MA H4348 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S2227
Note: Legislation replaced by H4515

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Advancing offshore wind and clean energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advancing offshore wind and clean energy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01HouseNew draft substituted, see H4515
2022-03-01HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2022-03-01HouseRules suspended
2022-03-01HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2022-03-01HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2022-03-01HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4515
2022-01-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2022-01-24HouseNew draft of S2227, H3294, H3302, H3310, H3313, H3328 and H4204
2022-01-24HouseReported from the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2227 (Replaces) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
S2154 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - House concurred
H3310 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
H3266 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4515 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Published as amended, see H4524
H4524 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Committee of conference appointed (Barrett-Creem-Tarr), in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback