MA S2145 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand equitable access for solar energy net metering. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Expanding equitable access for solar energy net metering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied H4524 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2208 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2216 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H4524 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5060
S2203 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2169 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3260 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2208 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2216 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H4524 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5060
S2203 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2169 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3260 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2145.pdf |