MA S2141 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to commercial fees. Transportation.
Title
Relative to commercial fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
H3094 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3086 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3101 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3015 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
H3094 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3086 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3101 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3015 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2141 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2141.pdf |