MA S2129 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make electric vehicles more affordable. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To make electric vehicles more affordable
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Barry Finegold [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2021-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3321 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H4134 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H3431 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3499 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4617
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3368 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3425 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
H3364 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3321 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H4134 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H3431 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3499 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4617
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3368 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3425 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
H3364 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2129 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2129.pdf |