MA S2127 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to analyze future need for electric vehicle infrastructure within the commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To analyze future need for electric vehicle infrastructure within the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2021-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Placed on file
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Placed on file
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2127 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2127.pdf |