MA S2105 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to civil asset forfeiture data reporting. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to civil asset forfeiture data reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-28SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2022-03-03SenateSenate concurred
2022-03-03SenateRules suspended
2022-02-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-10-13JointHearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
H4059 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2013 (Similar To) 2021-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H887 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback