MA H3233 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to civil asset forfeiture data reporting. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to civil asset forfeiture data reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-14HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2022-03-03SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-10-13JointHearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2105 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1724 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback