MA S2105 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to commercial plates for motor vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to commercial plates for motor vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2559 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2559 |
2019-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1757 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2760
H245 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4453
H2539 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2559 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H245 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4453
H2539 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2559 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2105 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2105.pdf |