MA H2539 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of commercial uses in common areas of condominium complexes. Revenue.
Title
Clarifying municipalities' rights to assess real estate taxes on commercial uses in common areas of condominium complexes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2540 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1301 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5108
H1302 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1301 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5108
H1302 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2539 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2539.pdf |