MA S2063 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce traffic and encourage shared rides. Transportation.
Title
To reduce traffic and encourage shared rides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Bill reported adversely by committee |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S102 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2895
S1755 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1039 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2033 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
S1755 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1039 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2033 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2063 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2063.pdf |