MA S102 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2895
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to transportation network company rider assessments. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to transportation network company rider assessments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2895 |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-08 | House | House concurred |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2063 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S888 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2026 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
S2895 (Replaced by) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S888 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2026 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
S2895 (Replaced by) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S102 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S102.pdf |