MA S1171 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to municipal authority to address congestion and emission impacts of TNCs. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal authority to address congestion and emission impacts of TNCs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2019-12-19HouseHouse concurred
2019-12-16SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H1039 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S102 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2036 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2035 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1066 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback