MA S2036 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to congestion in East Boston. Transportation.
Title
Relative to congestion in East Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2790 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2059 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S248 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H2184 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2790 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2059 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S248 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H2184 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2036 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2036.pdf |