MA S248 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to evaluate providing additional educational assistance to school districts with low or declining enrollment. Education.
Title
Evaluating providing additional educational assistance to school districts with low or declining enrollment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2059 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3110 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H542 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S302 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1195 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2054 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3110 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H542 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S302 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1195 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2054 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S248 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S248.pdf |