MA S495 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2388

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to mattress recycling. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to mattress recycling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-30SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2388
2019-10-07JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
S1990 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H831 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H765 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H799 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Senate concurred
S2388 (Replaced by) 2019-10-30 - Bill reported favorable by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback