MA H799 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Hecht of Watertown, a petition of Jonathan Hecht and others that the Department of Environmental Protection revise the regulations governing the rideshare program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To update the Massachusetts Rideshare Program
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-10 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S1990 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1834 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H1835 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S1990 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1834 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H1835 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H799 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H799.pdf |