MA S1944 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massachusetts Transportation Endowment Fund (MTEF). Transportation.
Title
To establish a Massachusetts Transportation Endowment Fund (MTEF)
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2435 |
2017-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1741 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1994 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1776 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1967 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2193
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2410 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2018
S2435 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1994 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1776 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1967 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2193
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2410 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2018
S2435 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1944 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1944.pdf |