MA S1942 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to charitable gaming. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to charitable gaming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/12/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-11-27 | House | House concurred |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1942 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1942.pdf |