MA S1856 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts State Exposition Building Maintenance Fund. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts State Exposition Building Maintenance Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S1216 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H121 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2091 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2412 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2281 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
S1216 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H121 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2091 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2412 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2281 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1856.pdf |