MA S1216 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote healthy communities and the environment. Public Health.
Title
To promote healthy communities and the environment
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H829 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H829 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1216 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1216.pdf |