MA S1827 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to commemorate first landing day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating first landing day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H2669 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
H2666 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
S1915 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
S1866 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
H2757 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
S1844 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
H2766 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
S2277 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback