MA H2669 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Ayers of Quincy, a petition of Bruce J. Ayers and others for the issuance by the Governor of an annual proclamation setting apart the month of October as adopt a shelter dog awareness month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the month of October as adopt a shelter dog month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-16HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2019-07-25HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H2709 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2666 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2757 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
S1915 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1827 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1866 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2277 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback