MA S1775 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1875
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S1875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S1875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jason Saunders, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jason Saunders, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S1875 |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Read second (as amended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S1875 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-04-24 | House | House concurred |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1875 (Replaced by) 2013-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2013
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1775 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1775.pdf |